GA HB1387 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the O.C.G.A., so as to correct typographical, stylistic, capitalization, punctuation, and other errors and omissions in the O.C.G.A. and in Acts of the General Assembly amending the O.C.G.A.; to reenact the statutory portion of the O.C.G.A., as amended; to provide for necessary or appropriate revisions and modernizations of matters contained in the O.C.G.A.; to repeal portions of the Code and Acts related thereto which have become obsolete; to delete portions of the Code and Acts related thereto which have been superseded by subsequent state laws; to provide for and to correct citations in the O.C.G.A. and other codes and laws of the state; to rearrange, renumber, and redesignate provisions of the O.C.G.A.; to provide for other matters relating to the O.C.G.A.; to provide for effect in event of conflicts; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Official Code of Georgia Annotated; correct errors and omissions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #801 - Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-03 | Act 624 | |
2010-06-03 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-16 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House First Readers |