GA HB1461 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Tennille, approved May 11, 2009 (Ga. L. 2009, p. 4370), so as to provide for the mayor's vote; to provide for the submission of ordinances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tennille, City of; mayor's vote; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #723 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 572 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers |