GA HB1472 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a charter for the Town of Gray in the County of Jones and the State of Georgia, approved August 22, 1911 (Ga. L. 1911, p. 1267), as amended, so as to provide for the powers of the mayor; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Gray, Town of; powers of mayor; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cole [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 585 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-31 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-31 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-26 | House First Readers |