GA HB1484 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Byron, approved February 13, 1941 (Ga. L. 1941, p. 1210), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3770), so as to change the corporate limits of the City of Byron; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Byron, City of; corporate city limits; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #755 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 559 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-04 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-04-13 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | House Third Readers | |
2010-04-13 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-04-01 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-31 | House First Readers |