GA HB1485 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create and establish in DeKalb County, Georgia, districts from which the members of the County Board of Education of DeKalb County shall be elected, approved April 12, 1963 (Ga. L. 1963, p. 3424), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 10, 2021 (Ga. L. 2021, p. 4256), so as to revise provisions related to changes in boundaries of the DeKalb County School District following certain annexations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; changes in boundaries of school district following certain annexations; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Lupton [D] | Rep. Long Tran [D] | Rep. Rhonda Taylor [D] | Rep. Imani Barnes [D] |
Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Billy Mitchell [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #716 (Y: 163 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68869 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227321 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68869#24313 |