GA HB1503 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating and establishing a joint airport authority for the City of Cartersville and Bartow County, Georgia, approved February 28, 1966 (Ga. L. 1966, p. 2270), so as to provide for additional members; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cartersville, City of; Bartow County; joint airport authority; provide for additional members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #728 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-18 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68937 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/227684 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68937#24356 |