GA HB152 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 3 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the regulation of alcoholic beverages generally, so as to impose certain requirements upon holders of certain alcohol licenses and those who issue such licenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; holders of certain alcohol licenses and those who issue such licenses; impose certain requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Jan Tankersley [R] | Rep. Charles Martin [R] |
Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Charles Williams [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #341 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #429 (Y: 151 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #386 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #233 (Y: 157 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #429 (Y: 151 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #386 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - House Vote #233 (Y: 157 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 78 | |
2015-05-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-14 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House Hopper |