GA HB154 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 9 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to workers' compensation, so as to change certain provisions relating to awards and benefits of workers' compensation; to provide for a limitation period on medical benefits; to provide for changes related to reimbursement of mileage charges; to provide for changes related to interest on lump sum payments of compensation; to provide for changes related to benefits for attempting work; to increase the compensation benefits for total disability and temporary partial disability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Worker's compensation; awards and benefits; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #171 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Vote #34 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Vote #34 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 203 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2013-01-30 | House | House Hopper |