GA HB154 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to domestic relations, so as to strengthen, clarify, and update provisions relating to the protection of children, including foster children and adopted children; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Domestic relations; protection of children; strengthen, clarify, and update provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #370 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #255 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #53 (Y: 160 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #255 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #53 (Y: 160 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 140 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hopper |