GA HB166 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the uniform rules of the road, so as to provide for the safe operation of a lightweight motorcycle or motor vehicle through an inoperative traffic-control signal; to repeal certain provisions relating to handlebars; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motorcycle Mobility Safety Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. John Yates [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Benjie Harbin [R] | Rep. Earnest Smith [D] |
Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #757 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #604 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Vote #604 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 334 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-29 | House | House Hopper |