GA HB169 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions concerning water resources, so as to require the Department of Natural Resources to notify affected property owners and local governments whenever the Federal Emergency Management Agency provides legal notice under the federal National Flood Insurance Program of any new or revised flood elevations that are proposed for any property located in this state; to provide for the manner and contents of such notices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Natural Resources, Department of; proposed new or revised flood elevations; require notice
Sponsors
Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Judith Manning [R] | Rep. Alisha Morgan [D] |
Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #926 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #468 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #525 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 55 N: 107 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #523 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 76 N: 90 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #508 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 55 N: 110 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #357 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #90 - Pass (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #468 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #525 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 55 N: 107 NV: 17 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #523 - Suspend One Hour Rule (Y: 76 N: 90 NV: 13 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #508 - Adopt Ccr (Y: 55 N: 110 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2009-04-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #357 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-26 - House - House Vote #90 - Pass (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 31 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 364 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-14 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Lost | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2009-04-03 | House Insists | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Insists | |
2009-04-03 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-03 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-17 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-29 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-28 | House First Readers |