GA HB198 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance, so as to provide for licensing of health insurance navigators under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; to provide for definitions; to provide for the powers and duties of the Commissioner of Insurance with respect to the foregoing; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; licensing of health insurance navigators; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. James Shaw [R] |
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Sen. Tim Golden [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Vote #303 (Y: 136 N: 24 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #166 (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #167 (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Vote #47 (Y: 154 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #166 (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #167 (Y: 37 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House Vote #47 (Y: 154 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 253 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-14 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-04 | House | House Hopper |