GA HB231 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-4-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the practice of architecture, qualifications and registration, exempt structures and persons, design-build contracts, predesign services, and construction contract administration services, so as to clarify the types of construction projects within planned or existing structures for which documents may be prepared, certified, and submitted for building permits by a Georgia registered interior designer; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Practice of architecture; projects within structures; clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Howard [D] | Rep. Sean Jerguson [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] |
Sen. David Shafer [R] | Rep. Roger Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #676 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House Vote #38 - Pass (Y: 129 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House Vote #37 - Dukes Am (Y: 36 N: 125 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2009-02-11 - House - House Vote #38 - Pass (Y: 129 N: 35 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House Vote #37 - Dukes Am (Y: 36 N: 125 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Effective Date | |
2010-06-02 | Act 545 | |
2010-06-02 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-01-11 | Senate Recommitted | |
2009-03-09 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-02-11 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-11 | House Third Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-02 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-30 | House First Readers |