GA HB245 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-212 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to salary schedules for certificated professional personnel under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to provide that an educator cannot be prohibited from enrolling in a leadership preparation program; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Quality Basic Education Act; educator cannot be prohibited from enrolling in a leadership preparation program; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/38515 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/130102 |