GA HB245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 1 of Part 6 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to certificated professional personnel, so as to provide for the establishment of a process by the Professional Standards Commission by which military spouses may qualify for temporary certificates, certificates by endorsement, or expedited certificates upon moving to Georgia with their service member or transitioning service member spouse; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Professional Standards Commission; establish process by which military spouses may qualify for temporary certificates; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #216 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #162 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #162 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 184 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-01 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Hopper |