GA HB264 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 9 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue bonds issued by the Geo. L. Smith II Georgia World Congress Center Authority, so as to increase the bonding capacity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia World Congress Center Authority; revenue bond capacity; increase
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #176 (Y: 45 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #122 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #122 (Y: 159 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-18 | Act 18 | |
2017-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |