GA HB282 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners for the County of Grady, approved December 22, 1937 (Ga. L. 1937-38, Ex. Sess. p. 837), as amended, so as to change the compensation of the board; to remove the board's authority to fix the salary of the chairperson; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Grady County; board of commissioners; change compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #62 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Vote #39 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-02 | Act 81 | |
2017-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-07 | House | House Hopper |