GA HB30 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for legislative findings; to amend Chapter 8 of Title 13 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to illegal or void contracts generally, so as to repeal Code Section 13-8-2.1, relating to contracts in partial restraint of trade; to change provisions relating to contracts contravening public policy; to repeal Article 4 of Chapter 8 of Title 13, relating to restrictive covenants in contracts; to provide a statement of legislative findings; to provide for rebuttable presumptions; to provide for enforcement by third-parties; to provide for construction; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Contracts; illegal or void; repeal certain code sections; change provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #412 - Recede From Senate Substitute (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #378 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 54 N: 111 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #294 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Vote #45 - Passage (Y: 104 N: 58 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #378 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 54 N: 111 NV: 12 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #294 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Vote #45 - Passage (Y: 104 N: 58 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 99 | |
2011-05-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-21 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Recedes from amend/sub | |
2011-04-14 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-28 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-02-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-15 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers | |
2010-12-17 | House Prefiled |