GA HB315 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-24 - Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 7 of Title 52 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the registration, operation, and sale of watercraft, so as to provide that it shall be a violation of law if a person's alcohol concentration is 0.08 grams or more at any time within three hours after operating, navigating, steering, driving, manipulating, or being in actual physical control of a moving vessel, moving water skis, moving aquaplane, moving surfboard, or similar moving device from alcohol consumed before such operating, navigating, steering, driving, manipulating, or being in actual physical control ended; to provide for certain presumptions at trial of such cases; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Watercraft operation; 0.08 alcohol concentration; violation; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Beardon [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Rep. Josh Clark [R] |
Rep. Kevin Cooke [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - House Vote #123 - Passage (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-24 | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-08 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-23 | House First Readers |