GA HB321 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V4
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-30-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to "group accident and sickness insurance" defined and "true association" defined, so as to provide for changes in the definitions of the terms; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance Delivery Enhancement Act of 2009; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #899 - Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #524 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 78 N: 85 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #443 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #219 - Pass (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - House Vote #524 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 78 N: 85 NV: 16 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2009-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #443 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - House - House Vote #219 - Pass (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Veto V4 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-21 | House Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-21 | House Insists | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Insists | |
2009-04-03 | House Disagrees Senate Amend/Sub | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-04-03 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2009-04-01 | Senate Tabled | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-03-12 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2009-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-06 | House First Readers |