GA HB362 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to student health in elementary and secondary education; to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to pharmacists and pharmacies, so as to authorize licensed health practitioners to prescribe albuterol sulfate for schools; to authorize pharmacists to fill such prescriptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Student health; licensed health practitioners to prescribe albuterol sulfate for schools; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] |
Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #890 (Y: 143 N: 14 NV: 19 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #815 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #250 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #98 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #815 (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #250 (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Vote #98 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 392 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House Postponed |
2015-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-17 | House | House Hopper |