GA HB375 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide for cancellations under certain circumstances relating to policy terms that permit an audit or rate investigation and noncompliance by the insured; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; cancellations under certain circumstances relating to policy terms that permit an audit or rate investigation and noncompliance by insured; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Vote #742 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #193 (Y: 172 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 656 | |
2014-04-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-11 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-19 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-14 | House | House Hopper |