GA HB407 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cancellation, suspension, and revocation of drivers' licenses, and Article 7 of Chapter 8 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ignition interlock devices as a condition of probation, so as to modify and extend provisions related to the mandatory use of ignition interlock devices following a second conviction for driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers' licenses; mandatory use of ignition interlock devices following second conviction for driving under influence of alcohol or drugs; modify and extend provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Alex Atwood [R] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 167 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #293 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #252 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #293 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Vote #252 (Y: 169 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-07 | Act 280 | |
2013-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | House | House Agrees Senate Amend or Sub |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-20 | House | House Hopper |