GA HB464 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 29 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to guardian and ward, so as to provide for when a petition for the appointment of a temporary guardian of a minor filed in the probate court may be transferred from the probate court to the juvenile court; to revise the assessment of certain costs, compensation, fees, and expenses; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Guardian and ward; petition for appointment of temporary guardian of minor filed in probate court may be transferred to juvenile court; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #727 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #232 (Y: 163 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #232 (Y: 163 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 742 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-16 | House | House Hopper |