GA HB47 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 29A of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to individual health insurance coverage, so as to authorize insurers to offer individual accident and sickness insurance policies in Georgia that have been approved for issuance in other states; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for a definition; to provide for minimum standards for such policies; to provide for certain notices; to authorize the Commissioner of Insurance to adopt rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health insurance; offer accident and sickness policies approved in other states; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] | Sen. Chip Rogers [R] | Rep. Donna Sheldon [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - House - House Vote #387 - Agree Sen Ams (Y: 98 N: 58 NV: 20 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #308 - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #307 - Adoption Of Amendment #20 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #306 - Adoption Of Amendment #19 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 19 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #305 - Adoption Of Amendment #18 By The Senator From The 43rd (Y: 21 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 - Adoption Of Amendment #17 By The Senator From The 43rd (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 - Adoption Of Amendment #16 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #302 - Adoption Of Amendment #15 By The Senator From The 35th (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 - Adoption Of Amendment #14 By The Senator From The 38th (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #300 - Adoption Of Amendment #12 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 18 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 - Adoption Of Amendment #11 By The Senator From The 42nd (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 - Adoption Of Amendment #10 By The Senator From The 15th (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 - Adoption Of Amendment #9 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 18 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #296 - Adoption Of Amendment #8 By The Senator From The 2nd (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #135 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #308 - Passage As Amended (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #307 - Adoption Of Amendment #20 By The Senator From The 41st (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #306 - Adoption Of Amendment #19 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 19 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #305 - Adoption Of Amendment #18 By The Senator From The 43rd (Y: 21 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #304 - Adoption Of Amendment #17 By The Senator From The 43rd (Y: 19 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 - Adoption Of Amendment #16 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 18 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #302 - Adoption Of Amendment #15 By The Senator From The 35th (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 - Adoption Of Amendment #14 By The Senator From The 38th (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #300 - Adoption Of Amendment #12 By The Senator From The 55th (Y: 18 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #299 - Adoption Of Amendment #11 By The Senator From The 42nd (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #298 - Adoption Of Amendment #10 By The Senator From The 15th (Y: 21 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 - Adoption Of Amendment #9 By The Senator From The 36th (Y: 18 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #296 - Adoption Of Amendment #8 By The Senator From The 2nd (Y: 23 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - House - House Vote #135 - Passage (Y: 111 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-13 | Act 249 | |
2011-05-13 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-26 | House Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-04-11 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2011-03-10 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | House Third Readers | |
2011-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2011-01-24 | House First Readers |