GA HB490 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 12 of Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to deposits of deceased depositors, so as to make changes relating to the payment of large deposits of deceased intestate depositors and the deposit of sums held for deceased intestate residents; to provide for and revise certain definitions; to provide for an affidavit for certain claimants to deposits; to provide a statutory form for an affidavit of the providers of services of funeral expenses and expenses of last illnesses of deceased depositors; to change certain provisions relating to payment of checks or instruments payable to decease intestate persons; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Banking and finance; payment of large deposits of deceased intestate depositors and the deposit of sums held for deceased intestate residents; make changes
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #414 (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #195 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #195 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-04-26 | Act 62 | |
2019-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | House | House Hopper |