GA HB493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to standards and requirements for construction, alteration, etc., of buildings and other structures, so as to provide procedures for alternative plan review, permitting, and inspection by private providers so as to simplify regulations on businesses at the local level; to provide for definitions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private Permitting Review and Inspection Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #347 (Y: 145 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #272 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #203 (Y: 142 N: 20 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06 Effective Date
2019-05-06 Act 215
2019-05-06HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-03-29HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2019-03-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback