GA HB495 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 and Article 2 of Chapter 1 of Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Georgia Bureau of Investigation and the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board, respectively, so as to revise the duties of the Georgia Bureau of Investigation and the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board relative to the board's determination of a sexual offender's risk assessment classification; to provide for definitions; to provide for certain investigators; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Bureau of Investigation and the Sexual Offender Registration Review Board; revise duties
Sponsors
Rep. Clint Crowe [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] |
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #343 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #225 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #225 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 199 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hopper |