GA HB509 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 30 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to group or blanket accident and sickness insurance, so as to require certain insurers to make at least one reasonably priced comprehensive major medical health insurance policy available to residents in this state without limitation or exclusion based on preexisting conditions; to condition such requirement on the repeal or judicial invalidation of certain provisions of the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; require certain insurers to make at least one reasonably priced comprehensive major medical health insurance policy available
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #299 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #117 (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #117 (Y: 121 N: 11 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 235 | |
2021-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hopper |