GA HB52 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 19-9-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to parenting plans, so as to change provisions requiring parenting plans to be incorporated into final orders involving the custody of a child; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Child custody; require parenting plans to be incorporated into final orders; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Johnnie Caldwell [R] | Rep. LaDawn Jones [D] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Rep. Beth Beskin [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - House - House Vote #775 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #579 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #33 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #579 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Vote #33 (Y: 174 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 362 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-13 | House | House Hopper |