GA HB555 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to provide for the reporting of certain statistics regarding juveniles seeking abortions without parental notice; to amend Article 5 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to abortion, so as to make reporting requirements applicable to all abortions performed; to amend Chapter 9A of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the "Woman's Right to Know Act," so as to make reporting requirements applicable to all abortions performed; to amend Part 1 of Article 1 of Chapter 18 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to State Employees' Health Insurance Plan, so as to clarify that elective abortions are not covered under the state health insurance plan; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; provide reporting of certain statistics regarding juveniles seeking abortions without parental notice; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Joyce Chandler [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. Valerie Clark [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #864 (Y: 114 N: 55 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #590 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #551 (Y: 119 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #798 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #590 (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House Vote #551 (Y: 119 N: 51 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 424 | |
2016-04-26 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-24 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Hopper |