GA HB617 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the State Court of Cobb County, approved March 26, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, p. 3211), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 4267), an Act approved May 12, 2008 (Ga. L. 2008, p. 3723), and an Act approved May 30, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3695), so as to raise the compensation of the chief deputy clerk and the clerk of the State Court of Cobb County; to raise the minimum and maximum allowable compensation for the chief assistant, each deputy chief assistant, each assistant, and each intake assistant solicitor of Cobb County; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; State Court; raise compensation of chief deputy clerk and clerk of court; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] |
Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #228 (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 267 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hopper |