GA HB642 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to establish the board of elections and registration for Cherokee County, Georgia; to provide for effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cherokee County; Board of Elections and Registration; establish
Sponsors
Rep. Jordan Ridley [R] | Rep. Charlice Byrd [R] | Rep. Brad Thomas [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #239 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #224 (Y: 97 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #224 (Y: 97 N: 70 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 167 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Hopper |