GA HB672 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a homestead exemption from all City of Sugar Hill ad valorem taxes for city purposes in the amount of $2,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of said city, excluding land in excess of one acre, approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4675), so as to increase the exemption from $2,000.00 to $10,000.00; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sugar Hill, City of; ad valorem tax; increase homestead exemption to $10,000.00
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Reeves [R] | Rep. Soo Hong [R] | Rep. David Clark [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #232 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #219 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 171 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | House | House Hopper |