GA HB704 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 3 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to limitations of actions on recovery for deficiencies connected with improvements to realty and resulting injuries, so as to change when the statute of limitations shall accrue for certain actions arising from the burial of construction waste or materials; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil practice; burial of construction waste or materials; change when statute of limitations shall accrue for certain actions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-18 | House | House Hopper |