GA HB707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for a new homestead exemption from City of Roswell ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for related matters; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Roswell, City of; ad valorem tax; provide new homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #582 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #626 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #509 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #626 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Vote #509 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 486 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Reconsidered |
2018-02-14 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-19 | House | House Hopper |