GA HB718 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Subpart 2 of Part 1 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to compulsory attendance, so as to excuse certain absences of students with parents in service of the armed forces of the United States, the Reserves, or the National Guard or veterans of same; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; certain absences of students with parents in service of the armed forces of the United States; excuse
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] | Rep. Erica Thomas [D] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #646 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #632 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #632 (Y: 171 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 332 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-22 | House | House Hopper |