GA HB726 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Veto V7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to taxes on tobacco products, so as to clarify that certain charges are not subject to state excise tax; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Excise tax; tobacco products; clarify certain charges
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Geoff Duncan [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #616 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #633 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #517 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #633 (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Vote #517 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | Veto V7 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-28 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-12 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-11 | House | House Hopper |