GA HB757 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Senate Third Read Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding ad valorem taxation of property, so as to provide that use of certain property for collection and conversion of solar energy shall not constitute a breach of conservation use covenants; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad valorem tax; use of certain property for collection and conversion of solar energy shall not constitute breach of conservation use covenants; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. James Epps [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #733 (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #602 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #602 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read Lost |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-01-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-17 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-16 | House | House Hopper |