GA HB758 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 1 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Georgia Motor Carrier Act of 2012," so as to prohibit the consideration of the deployment of motor carrier safety improvements in determining an individual's employment status with a motor carrier; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Motor Carrier Act of 2012; consideration of the deployment of motor carrier safety improvements in determining an individual's employment status with a motor carrier; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #708 (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 99 N: 68 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 490 | |
2020-07-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-14 | House | House Hopper |