GA HB759 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedule IV controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of dangerous drug; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; Schedule IV; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Jon Burns [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #728 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #455 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Vote #455 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 372 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-16 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-14 | House | House Hopper |