GA HB763 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the state sales and use tax, so as to remove the sunset for the exemption regarding certain food and food ingredients; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; exemption regarding certain food and food ingredients; remove sunset
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] | Rep. David Knight [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] |
Rep. Chad Nimmer [R] | Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #657 (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #672 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #571 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #672 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Vote #571 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 602 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-01-14 | House | House First Readers |
2016-01-13 | House | House Hopper |