GA HB771 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the Heard County Board of Education, approved March 28, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 5078), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3661), so as to provide a new method of compensating the members of the Heard County Board of Education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Heard County; Board of Education; provide new method of compensating members
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #434 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Vote #461 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 337 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-30 | House | House Hopper |