GA HB791 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 21 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waiver of sovereign immunity as to actions ex contractu and state tort claims, so as to provide for a limited waiver of the state's sovereign immunity for declaratory or injunctive relief under certain circumstances; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to provide for immunity of state officers and employees in their individual capacity; to provide for notice of a claim; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; limited waiver of the state's sovereign immunity for declaratory or injunctive relief under certain circumstance; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Terry Rogers [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #601 (Y: 177 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-31 | House | House Hopper |