GA HB816 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-2 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to state sales and use taxes, so as to change a certain definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; change a certain definition
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Virgil Fludd [D] |
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. Allen Peake [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #751 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #575 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #647 (Y: 36 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #575 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-24 | Act 620 | |
2014-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-23 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-22 | House | House Hopper |