GA HB826 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-23 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 35 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to provide that an alarm monitoring company may contract out the requirement of attempting to verify an alarm prior to requesting law enforcement to be dispatched to the location of the alarm; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Law enforcement; alarm monitoring company may contract out certain requirement; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Vote #549 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Hopper |