GA HB826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide for a new charter for the City of Meigs in Thomas County, Georgia, and Mitchell County, Georgia, approved April 30, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 3695), so as to provide for elections and terms of office; to eliminate one council post in the city; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Meigs, City of; elections and terms of office; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #491 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #471 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Vote #471 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 361 | |
2020-06-29 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-28 | House | House Hopper |