GA HB827 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-04 - Veto V2
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 45-9-85 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to payment of indemnification for death or disability, procedure for making of payments, and appeal, so as to change provisions relating to indemnification for the death or disability of a highway employee; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Highway employees; death or disability; indemnification; change provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Goggans [R] | Rep. Chuck Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #822 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Veto V2 | |
2010-06-04 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-07 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-30 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-26 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-04-01 | House Second Readers | |
2009-03-30 | House First Readers |