GA HB835 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-15 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions relating to Schedules I, III, and IV controlled substances; to change certain provisions relating to the definition of "dangerous drug"; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled substances; Schedules I, III, and IV; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Tom Weldon [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #673 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #497 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Vote #497 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 518 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-01-24 | House | House First Readers |
2014-01-23 | House | House Hopper |