GA HB839 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Clayton County Water Authority, approved March 7, 1955 (Ga. L. 1955, p. 3344), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2005 (Ga. L. 2005, p. 3827), so as to change the compensation of members of the authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Clayton County Water Authority; change compensation of members
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Rhonda Burnough [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] |
Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #588 (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Vote #500 (Y: 107 N: 50 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 376 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-06 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-05 | House | House Hopper |